California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1246 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 15, 2018

Enrolled

Bill August 21, 2018

Chaptered

Bill September 11, 2018

Amended

Bill June 27, 2018
Bill May 16, 2018
Bill April 30, 2018