Senate | 05/25/2018 | May 25 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. | ||
Senate | 05/18/2018 | Set for hearing May 25. | ||
Senate | 05/07/2018 | May 7 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. | ||
Senate | 04/27/2018 | Set for hearing May 7. | ||
Senate | 04/25/2018 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4819.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 04/12/2018 | Set for hearing April 24. | ||
Senate | 04/12/2018 | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | ||
Senate | 04/03/2018 | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 04/03/2018 | Withdrawn from committee. | ||
Senate | 04/02/2018 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. | ||
Senate | 03/01/2018 | Referred to Com. on N.R. & W. | ||
Senate | 02/16/2018 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18. | ||
Senate | 02/15/2018 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |