|
09/17/2018
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 464, Statutes of 2018.
|
|
|
|
09/17/2018
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2018
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 6 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/23/2018
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 6474.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/09/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/08/2018
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (August 8).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/21/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/31/2018
|
June 6 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/10/2018
|
Referred to Com. on L. & E.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/03/2018
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 4939.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2018
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2018
|
Set for hearing April 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2018
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2018
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 4626.) (April 11).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2018
|
Set for hearing April 11.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2018
|
Referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2018
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2018
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|