|
09/30/2018
|
In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2018
|
Vetoed by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/06/2018
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/29/2018
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 27. Noes 11. Page 5958.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/28/2018
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/28/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 46. Noes 27. Page 6734.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2018
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2018
|
Read third time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/08/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/07/2018
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/06/2018
|
(Received pursuant to JR 61(b)(14)).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/06/2018
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (July 3).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/26/2018
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/25/2018
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 20).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/11/2018
|
Referred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/31/2018
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 25. Noes 12. Page 4420.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2018
|
Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2018
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2018
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 4. Noes 2. Page 4997.) (May 8).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2018
|
Set for hearing May 8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 8. Noes 2. Page 4724.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2018
|
Set for hearing April 17.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2018
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2018
|
Referred to Coms. on T. & H. and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2018
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2018
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|