|
07/16/2018
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 114, Statutes of 2018.
|
|
|
|
07/16/2018
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/05/2018
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2018
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/28/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 6033.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/21/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/20/2018
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 20).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/17/2018
|
June 6 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/03/2018
|
Referred to Com. on P.E., R., & S.S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/23/2018
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4763.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2018
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 4605.) (April 9).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2018
|
Set for hearing April 9.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2018
|
Referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2018
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2018
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|