Assembly
|
08/16/2018
|
August 16 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/16/2018
|
Joint Rule 62(a) suspended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/15/2018
|
August 15 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/08/2018
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/26/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/21/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/11/2018
|
Referred to Coms. on L. & E. and JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/31/2018
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 24. Noes 13. Page 4464.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2018
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2018
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 4307.) (May 25).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2018
|
Set for hearing May 25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2018
|
May 7 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2018
|
Set for hearing May 7.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2018
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2018
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 4723.) (April 17).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2018
|
Set for hearing April 17.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 4626.) (April 11). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2018
|
Set for hearing April 11.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2018
|
Re-referred to Coms. on L. & I.R. and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2018
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2018
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2018
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|