Senate | 05/25/2018 | May 25 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. | ||
Senate | 05/18/2018 | Set for hearing May 25. | ||
Senate | 05/07/2018 | May 7 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. | ||
Senate | 04/27/2018 | Set for hearing May 7. | ||
Senate | 04/25/2018 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 4817.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 04/20/2018 | Set for hearing April 25. | ||
Senate | 04/17/2018 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. & I.R. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 4700.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on L. & I.R. | ||
Senate | 04/05/2018 | Set for hearing April 17. | ||
Senate | 04/04/2018 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | ||
Senate | 03/01/2018 | Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and L. & I.R. | ||
Senate | 02/20/2018 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22. | ||
Senate | 02/16/2018 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |