|
09/28/2018
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 900, Statutes of 2018.
|
|
|
|
09/28/2018
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/12/2018
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2018
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 6116.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2018
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2018
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 6982.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2018
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2018
|
From consent calendar on motion of Assembly Member Calderon.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2018
|
Read third time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/16/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/15/2018
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 15).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/27/2018
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/26/2018
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 26).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/20/2018
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/19/2018
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (June 19).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/11/2018
|
Referred to Coms. on B. & P. and JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/31/2018
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 4464.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2018
|
Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2018
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2018
|
Set for hearing May 14.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2018
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4815.) (April 24).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2018
|
Set for hearing April 24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 4697.) (April 16). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2018
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on B., P. & E.D. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 4557.) (April 4). Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2018
|
Set for hearing April 16.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2018
|
Set for hearing April 4.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2018
|
Referred to Coms. on HEALTH, B., P. & E.D., and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2018
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2018
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|