|
09/18/2018
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 517, Statutes of 2018.
|
|
|
|
09/18/2018
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/10/2018
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/28/2018
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/27/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6599.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/20/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/16/2018
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 16).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/27/2018
|
June 27 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/19/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/14/2018
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/31/2018
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 4456.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2018
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2018
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4308.) (May 25).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2018
|
Set for hearing May 25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2018
|
April 30 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2018
|
Set for hearing April 30.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4723.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2018
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2018
|
Set for hearing April 17.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2018
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2018
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|