LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2017-2018 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB1336
Action History
CA
California Senate Bill SB1336
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2017-2018 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB1336
Action History
Senate
04/02/2018
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
Senate
03/29/2018
Set for hearing April 11.
Senate
03/01/2018
Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and JUD.
Senate
02/20/2018
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22.
Senate
02/16/2018
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.