|
09/19/2018
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 566, Statutes of 2018.
|
|
|
|
09/19/2018
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/12/2018
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2018
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 29. Noes 9. Page 6192.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2018
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/29/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/28/2018
|
Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/28/2018
|
Assembly Rule 96 suspended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/28/2018
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on U. & E.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/28/2018
|
Withdrawn from committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/27/2018
|
Re-referred to Com. on U. & E. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2018
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2018
|
Read third time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/16/2018
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (August 16).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/08/2018
|
August 8 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/06/2018
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/05/2018
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/03/2018
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 2.) (June 27).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/04/2018
|
Referred to Com. on U. & E.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/29/2018
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 29. Noes 8. Page 4353.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2018
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 4308.) (May 25).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2018
|
Set for hearing May 25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2018
|
May 22 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2018
|
Set for hearing May 22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2018
|
May 14 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2018
|
Set for hearing May 14.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2018
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2018
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2018
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 7. Noes 2. Page 4718.) (April 17).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2018
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2018
|
Set for hearing April 17.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2018
|
Referred to Com. on E., U. & C.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2018
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2018
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|