|
09/30/2018
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 956, Statutes of 2018.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2018
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/12/2018
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2018
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 6116.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2018
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2018
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6973.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2018
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2018
|
Read third time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/21/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/20/2018
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/16/2018
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (August 16).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/08/2018
|
August 8 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/27/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/19/2018
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. & E.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/18/2018
|
Referred to Com. on L. & E.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/31/2018
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4379.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2018
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 4309.) (May 25).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2018
|
Set for hearing May 25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2018
|
April 30 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2018
|
Set for hearing April 30.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2018
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2018
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4723.) (April 17).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2018
|
Set for hearing April 17.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 4626.) (April 11). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2018
|
Set for hearing April 11.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2018
|
Referred to Coms. on L. & I.R. and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2018
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2018
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|