Senate | 04/23/2018 | April 25 set for second hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 04/17/2018 | Set for hearing April 25. | ||
Senate | 04/16/2018 | April 18 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 04/13/2018 | Set for hearing April 18. | ||
Senate | 04/12/2018 | Re-referred to Com. on ED. | ||
Senate | 04/02/2018 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 03/08/2018 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 02/20/2018 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22. | ||
Senate | 02/16/2018 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |