Assembly | 06/19/2018 | June 19 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Assembly | 04/30/2018 | Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. | ||
Assembly | 04/23/2018 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 04/23/2018 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4764.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 04/17/2018 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 04/16/2018 | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 04/09/2018 | Set for hearing April 16. | ||
Senate | 04/04/2018 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 4533.) (April 4). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 03/13/2018 | Set for hearing April 4. | ||
Senate | 03/08/2018 | Referred to Com. on ED. | ||
Senate | 02/20/2018 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22. | ||
Senate | 02/16/2018 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |