|
09/22/2018
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 700, Statutes of 2018.
|
|
|
|
09/22/2018
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/10/2018
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/28/2018
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 27. Noes 12. Page 5870.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/28/2018
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/27/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 57. Noes 22. Page 6584.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2018
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2018
|
Read third time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/16/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/15/2018
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (August 15).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/09/2018
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/27/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 1.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/04/2018
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/29/2018
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 27. Noes 11. Page 4339.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2018
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2018
|
Set for hearing May 22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1. Page 4853.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2018
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2018
|
Set for hearing April 25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2018
|
April 18 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2018
|
Set for hearing April 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2018
|
Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2018
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2018
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2018
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2018
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|