|
09/18/2018
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 520, Statutes of 2018.
|
|
|
|
09/18/2018
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/10/2018
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2018
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 6061.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/29/2018
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/28/2018
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/28/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 6718.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/20/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/16/2018
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 16).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/08/2018
|
August 8 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/26/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/20/2018
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/26/2018
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/09/2018
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 4579.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2018
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0. Page 4517.) (April 3).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2018
|
Set for hearing April 3.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2018
|
Referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2018
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2018
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|