Senate | 05/31/2018 | Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 18. Noes 16. Page 4462.) | ||
Senate | 05/29/2018 | Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4361.) | ||
Senate | 05/29/2018 | Motion to reconsider made by Senator Mitchell. | ||
Senate | 05/29/2018 | Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 17. Noes 14. Page 4361.) | ||
Senate | 05/10/2018 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 05/09/2018 | Ordered to second reading. | ||
Senate | 05/09/2018 | Read third time and amended. | ||
Senate | 04/16/2018 | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. | ||
Senate | 04/09/2018 | Set for hearing April 16. | ||
Senate | 04/03/2018 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 4516.) (April 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 03/20/2018 | Set for hearing April 3. | ||
Senate | 03/08/2018 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | ||
Senate | 02/20/2018 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22. | ||
Senate | 02/16/2018 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |