|
09/30/2018
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 1013, Statutes of 2018.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2018
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/07/2018
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2018
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/16/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/15/2018
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 5.) (August 15).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/27/2018
|
June 27 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/12/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/25/2018
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/15/2018
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 23. Noes 14. Page 5037.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2018
|
Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2018
|
Read third time and amended.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2018
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2018
|
Set for hearing April 16.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 4516.) (April 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2018
|
Set for hearing April 3.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2018
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2018
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|