Assembly | 08/16/2018 | August 16 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. | ||
Assembly | 08/08/2018 | August 8 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 06/26/2018 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 06/25/2018 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 2.) (June 19). | ||
Assembly | 06/11/2018 | Referred to Com. on P. & C.P. | ||
Assembly | 05/31/2018 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 05/31/2018 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4463.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 05/29/2018 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 05/25/2018 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | ||
Senate | 05/25/2018 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4309.) (May 25). | ||
Senate | 05/18/2018 | Set for hearing May 25. | ||
Senate | 05/14/2018 | May 14 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. | ||
Senate | 05/04/2018 | Set for hearing May 14. | ||
Senate | 04/26/2018 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0. Page 4786.) (April 24). | ||
Senate | 03/22/2018 | Set for hearing April 24. | ||
Senate | 03/08/2018 | Referred to Com. on G.O. | ||
Senate | 02/20/2018 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22. | ||
Senate | 02/16/2018 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |