LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2017-2018 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB14
Action History
CA
California Senate Bill SB14
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2017-2018 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB14
Action History
Senate
02/01/2018
Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Senate
03/07/2017
March 28 hearing postponed by committee.
Senate
03/02/2017
Set for hearing March 28.
Senate
01/12/2017
Referred to Coms. on V.A. and GOV. & F.
Senate
12/06/2016
From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 5.
Senate
12/05/2016
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.