|
09/11/2018
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 361, Statutes of 2018.
|
|
|
|
09/11/2018
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/24/2018
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/20/2018
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 5430.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/16/2018
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/16/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 6314.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/13/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/09/2018
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/08/2018
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 8).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/21/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/10/2018
|
Referred to Com. on U. & E.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/03/2018
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4938.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2018
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2018
|
Set for hearing April 16.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 4514.) (April 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2018
|
Set for hearing April 3.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2018
|
Referred to Com. on E., U. & C.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2018
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2018
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|