California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1412 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 16, 2018

Enrolled

Bill September 7, 2018

Chaptered

Bill September 30, 2018

Amended

Bill August 23, 2018
Bill July 3, 2018
Bill June 19, 2018
Bill May 25, 2018