Senate | 04/11/2018 | April 16 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 04/06/2018 | Set for hearing April 16. | ||
Senate | 04/04/2018 | Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. | ||
Senate | 03/22/2018 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 03/08/2018 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 02/20/2018 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22. | ||
Senate | 02/16/2018 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |