|
09/30/2018
|
In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2018
|
Vetoed by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/28/2018
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/21/2018
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 30. Noes 3. Page 5548.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/21/2018
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/20/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 60. Noes 0. Page 6400.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/16/2018
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/16/2018
|
Read third time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/28/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/27/2018
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 27).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/12/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (June 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/07/2018
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/25/2018
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/10/2018
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 31. Noes 4. Page 5010.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2018
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2018
|
Set for hearing May 7.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 4816.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2018
|
Set for hearing April 24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2018
|
Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2018
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2018
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2018
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2018
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|