Assembly | 08/16/2018 | August 16 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. | ||
Assembly | 08/08/2018 | August 8 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 07/02/2018 | (Received June 29 pursuant to Joint Rule 61(b)(13)). | ||
Assembly | 07/02/2018 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 06/11/2018 | Referred to Com. on G.O. | ||
Assembly | 05/31/2018 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 05/31/2018 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 4457.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 05/29/2018 | Ordered to special consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 05/25/2018 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 05/25/2018 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4310.) (May 25). | ||
Senate | 05/18/2018 | Set for hearing May 25. | ||
Senate | 05/07/2018 | May 7 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. | ||
Senate | 04/27/2018 | Set for hearing May 7. | ||
Senate | 04/24/2018 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0. Page 4786.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 04/17/2018 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O. | ||
Senate | 04/10/2018 | Set for hearing April 24. | ||
Senate | 02/20/2018 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22. | ||
Senate | 02/16/2018 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |