Senate | 04/24/2018 | April 23 set for first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 1. Noes 3. Page 4789.) Reconsideration granted. | ||
Senate | 04/11/2018 | Set for hearing April 23. | ||
Senate | 04/04/2018 | Re-referred to Com. on P.E. & R. | ||
Senate | 04/02/2018 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 03/08/2018 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 02/20/2018 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22. | ||
Senate | 02/16/2018 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |