Assembly
|
08/16/2018
|
August 16 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/08/2018
|
August 8 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/06/2018
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/02/2018
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/28/2018
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (June 27).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/21/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on C. & C. (Ayes 10. Noes 3.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on C. & C.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/11/2018
|
Referred to Coms. on U. & E. and C. & C.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/29/2018
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 29. Noes 7. Page 4355.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2018
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 4310.) (May 25).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2018
|
Set for hearing May 25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2018
|
May 14 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2018
|
Set for hearing May 14.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2018
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 1. Page 4851.) (April 25).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2018
|
Set for hearing April 25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2018
|
Re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2018
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2018
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2018
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2018
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|