|
09/26/2017
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 305, Statutes of 2017.
|
|
|
|
09/26/2017
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2017
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/05/2017
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/05/2017
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 2960.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/20/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/19/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (July 19).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/27/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/12/2017
|
Referred to Com. on W.,P., & W.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/01/2017
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2017
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1354.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2017
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1178.) (May 25).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Set for hearing May 25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2017
|
April 3 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2017
|
Set for hearing April 3.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2017
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2017
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 363.) (March 14).
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2017
|
Set for hearing March 14.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2017
|
Referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/17/2017
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 16.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/13/2017
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|