Senate | 04/25/2018 | April 24 set for second hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 3. Noes 2. Page 4820.) | ||
Senate | 04/18/2018 | Set for hearing April 24. | ||
Senate | 04/17/2018 | April 17 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 04/05/2018 | Set for hearing April 17. | ||
Senate | 04/04/2018 | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | ||
Senate | 04/02/2018 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 03/08/2018 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 02/20/2018 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22. | ||
Senate | 02/16/2018 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |