Assembly | 05/10/2018 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 05/10/2018 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 5014.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 05/08/2018 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 05/07/2018 | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 04/27/2018 | Set for hearing May 7. | ||
Senate | 04/24/2018 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0. Page 4786.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 04/17/2018 | Set for hearing April 24. | ||
Senate | 04/16/2018 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O. | ||
Senate | 04/04/2018 | Re-referred to Com. on G.O. | ||
Senate | 04/02/2018 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 03/08/2018 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 02/20/2018 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22. | ||
Senate | 02/16/2018 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |