|
09/26/2018
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 796, Statutes of 2018.
|
|
|
|
09/26/2018
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/28/2018
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2018
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 37. Noes 2. Page 5605.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/21/2018
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/20/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6405.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/06/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/05/2018
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/03/2018
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (July 3).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/11/2018
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/31/2018
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 34. Noes 4. Page 4396.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2018
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 4311.) (May 25).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2018
|
Set for hearing May 25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2018
|
May 22 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2018
|
Set for hearing May 22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2018
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2018
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 4915.) (May 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2018
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2018
|
Set for hearing May 1.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2018
|
Referred to Coms. on JUD. and APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2018
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2018
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|