|
10/13/2017
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 767, Statutes of 2017.
|
|
|
|
10/13/2017
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2017
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/05/2017
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2476.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2017
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 2840.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2017
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2017
|
Read third time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/17/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/13/2017
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/12/2017
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (July 12).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/03/2017
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/01/2017
|
Referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/23/2017
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 25. Noes 6. Page 1143.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2017
|
Published May 9 at 9 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2017
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2017
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 945.) (May 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2017
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2017
|
Set for hearing May 2.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2017
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/18/2017
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 17.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/17/2017
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|