Senate | 05/25/2018 | May 25 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. | ||
Senate | 05/18/2018 | Set for hearing May 25. | ||
Senate | 05/07/2018 | May 7 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. | ||
Senate | 04/27/2018 | Set for hearing May 7. | ||
Senate | 04/25/2018 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 04/24/2018 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 4722.) (April 18). | ||
Senate | 04/06/2018 | Set for hearing April 18. | ||
Senate | 03/08/2018 | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. | ||
Senate | 02/20/2018 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22. | ||
Senate | 02/16/2018 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |