Senate | 04/23/2018 | April 24 hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Senate | 04/10/2018 | Set for hearing April 24. | ||
Senate | 04/05/2018 | April 10 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 03/22/2018 | Set for hearing April 10. | ||
Senate | 03/08/2018 | Referred to Com. on G.O. | ||
Senate | 02/20/2018 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22. | ||
Senate | 02/16/2018 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |