06/01/2018 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 24, Statutes of 2018. | |||
06/01/2018 | Approved by the Governor. | |||
Senate | 05/23/2018 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10:30 a.m. | ||
Senate | 05/17/2018 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Assembly | 05/17/2018 | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 5220.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 05/14/2018 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | ||
Assembly | 05/10/2018 | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (May 9). | ||
Assembly | 04/23/2018 | Referred to Com. on L. GOV. | ||
Assembly | 04/12/2018 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 04/12/2018 | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4641.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 04/04/2018 | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 4535.) (April 4). | ||
Senate | 03/22/2018 | Set for hearing April 4. | ||
Senate | 03/15/2018 | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. | ||
Senate | 03/02/2018 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after April 1. | ||
Senate | 03/01/2018 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |