|
07/16/2018
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 117, Statutes of 2018.
|
|
|
|
07/16/2018
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/11/2018
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/05/2018
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/05/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 69. Noes 0. Page 6109.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/28/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/27/2018
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (June 27).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/19/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/13/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 12). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/25/2018
|
Referred to Coms. on V.A. and JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/17/2018
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 5091.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2018
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2018
|
Set for hearing May 14.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4815.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2018
|
Set for hearing April 24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4629.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2018
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on V.A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2018
|
Set for hearing April 10.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2018
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after April 6.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2018
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|