|
07/16/2018
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 119, Statutes of 2018.
|
|
|
|
07/16/2018
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/11/2018
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/05/2018
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/05/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 69. Noes 0. Page 6109.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/28/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/27/2018
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (June 27).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/12/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/25/2018
|
Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/10/2018
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 5015.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2018
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2018
|
Set for hearing May 7.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4812.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2018
|
Set for hearing April 25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2018
|
Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2018
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after April 21.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2018
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|