|
08/20/2018
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 181, Statutes of 2018.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2018
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/09/2018
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/06/2018
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 5164.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/25/2018
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/25/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 5978.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/20/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/19/2018
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 18).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/11/2018
|
June 11 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/11/2018
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/25/2018
|
Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/10/2018
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 5011.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2018
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4915.) (May 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2018
|
Set for hearing May 2.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2018
|
Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2018
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after April 21.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2018
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|