|
10/05/2017
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 497, Statutes of 2017.
|
|
|
|
10/05/2017
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/20/2017
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/14/2017
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2903.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/12/2017
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/08/2017
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/07/2017
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 73. Noes 2. Page 3037.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (August 30).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/28/2017
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2017
|
August 23 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/28/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/08/2017
|
Referred to Com. on V.A.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/31/2017
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2017
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1246.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2017
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2017
|
Set for hearing May 15.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2017
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2017
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 830.) (April 25).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2017
|
Set for hearing April 25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2017
|
Re-referred to Com. on V.A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2017
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2017
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/19/2017
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/18/2017
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|