Assembly
|
09/01/2017
|
September 1 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2017
|
August 23 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/12/2017
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/11/2017
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (July 10).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/03/2017
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/18/2017
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/01/2017
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 903.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 806.) (April 24).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2017
|
Set for hearing April 24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2017
|
April 17 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2017
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2017
|
Set for hearing April 17.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0. Page 626.) (April 4). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2017
|
Set for hearing April 4.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2017
|
Referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/20/2017
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 19.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/19/2017
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|