Senate | 02/01/2018 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Senate | 04/26/2017 | April 25 set for second hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 04/20/2017 | Set for hearing April 25. | ||
Senate | 04/19/2017 | April 18 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 04/18/2017 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Senate | 04/13/2017 | Set for hearing April 18. | ||
Senate | 02/02/2017 | Referred to Coms. on JUD. and E. & C.A. | ||
Senate | 01/20/2017 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 19. | ||
Senate | 01/19/2017 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |