|
09/29/2017
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 368, Statutes of 2017.
|
|
|
|
09/29/2017
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/22/2017
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/15/2017
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 28. Noes 9. Page 2959.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/15/2017
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/14/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 59. Noes 18. Page 3418.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2017
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2017
|
Assembly Rule 96 suspended. (Ayes 51. Noes 23. Page 2826.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2017
|
Withdrawn from committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/13/2017
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/12/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (July 12). Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/03/2017
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/28/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/15/2017
|
Referred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/01/2017
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 30. Noes 10. Page 1384.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Published May 23 at 9 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2017
|
Read third time and amended.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2017
|
Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2017
|
Set for hearing May 22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2017
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2017
|
Published May 9 at 9 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2017
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2017
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 945.) (May 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2017
|
Set for hearing May 2.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2017
|
April 25 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2017
|
Set for hearing April 25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 9. Noes 2. Page 750.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2017
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2017
|
Set for hearing April 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2017
|
April 4 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2017
|
Set for hearing April 4.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2017
|
Re-referred to Coms. on T. & H., JUD., and APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2017
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2017
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2017
|
Set for hearing March 28.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2017
|
Referred to Coms. on HUMAN S. and PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2017
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/23/2017
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|