California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB173 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 23, 2017

Enrolled

Bill September 20, 2017

Chaptered

Bill October 15, 2017

Amended

Bill September 8, 2017
Bill July 10, 2017
Bill May 26, 2017