|
10/11/2017
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 678, Statutes of 2017.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2017
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2017
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/06/2017
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 37. Noes 3. Page 2524.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/05/2017
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/05/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 57. Noes 9. Page 2970.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/28/2017
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/28/2017
|
Read third time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 1.) (August 23).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/13/2017
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/27/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/20/2017
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/12/2017
|
Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and HUM. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/31/2017
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 4. Page 1250.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2017
|
Published May 26 at 10 a.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2017
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2017
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 1179.) (May 25).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Set for hearing May 25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2017
|
April 24 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2017
|
Set for hearing April 24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 624.) (April 4). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2017
|
Set for hearing April 4.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2017
|
April 25 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2017
|
Set for hearing April 25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HUMAN S. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 429.) (March 21). Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
|
|
|