|
10/08/2017
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 593, Statutes of 2017.
|
|
|
|
10/08/2017
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/19/2017
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/13/2017
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2838.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/13/2017
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/12/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 3200.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/05/2017
|
Read third time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/05/2017
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/01/2017
|
From consent calendar on motion of Assembly Member Calderon.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (August 30).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2017
|
August 23 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2017
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/19/2017
|
July 19 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/28/2017
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/27/2017
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (June 26).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/18/2017
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/20/2017
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 767.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 708.) (April 17).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2017
|
Set for hearing April 17.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (March 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2017
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2017
|
Set for hearing March 28.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/12/2017
|
Referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/06/2016
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 5.
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/05/2016
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|