|
10/12/2017
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 733, Statutes of 2017.
|
|
|
|
10/12/2017
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/22/2017
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/15/2017
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 28. Noes 9. Page 3009.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/15/2017
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/15/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 58. Noes 15. Page 3491.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/13/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/12/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (September 11).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/08/2017
|
Joint Rule 62(a) suspended. (Ayes 51. Noes 23. Page 3083.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/08/2017
|
Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/08/2017
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/08/2017
|
Read third time and amended. (Ayes 54. Noes 18. Page 3082.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/08/2017
|
Assembly Rule 69(b)(1) suspended. (Ayes 50. Noes 24. Page 3067.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/05/2017
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/01/2017
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 5.) (September 1).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2017
|
August 23 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/21/2017
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/11/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 2.) (July 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/03/2017
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/28/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/08/2017
|
Referred to Coms. on HUM. S. and JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/31/2017
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 28. Noes 12. Page 1282.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2017
|
Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1282.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2017
|
Motion to reconsider made by Senator Mitchell.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 31. Noes 7. Page 1249.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1179.) (May 25).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Set for hearing May 25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2017
|
May 15 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2017
|
Set for hearing May 15.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2017
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2017
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 851.) (April 25).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2017
|
Set for hearing April 25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2017
|
April 18 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2017
|
Set for hearing April 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 624.) (April 4). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2017
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2017
|
Set for hearing April 4.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2017
|
Referred to Coms. on HUMAN S. and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2017
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 4.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2017
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|