|
10/04/2017
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 483, Statutes of 2017.
|
|
|
|
10/04/2017
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/19/2017
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/13/2017
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 27. Noes 12. Page 2838.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/13/2017
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/12/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 55. Noes 19. Page 3203.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/08/2017
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/08/2017
|
Read third time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/05/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/01/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 5.) (September 1).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2017
|
August 23 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/21/2017
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/12/2017
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/11/2017
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (July 11).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/05/2017
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/22/2017
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/21/2017
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 20).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/15/2017
|
Referred to Coms. on AGING & L.T.C. and JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/01/2017
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 26. Noes 12. Page 1315.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2017
|
Published May 26 at 10 a.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2017
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2017
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1179.) (May 25).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Set for hearing May 25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2017
|
May 15 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2017
|
Set for hearing May 15.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2017
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 851.) (April 25).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2017
|
Set for hearing April 25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2017
|
April 18 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2017
|
Set for hearing April 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 3. Noes 1.) (March 28). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2017
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2017
|
Set for hearing March 28.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2017
|
Referred to Coms. on HUMAN S. and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2017
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 4.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2017
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|