Senate | 02/01/2018 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Senate | 05/25/2017 | May 25 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. | ||
Senate | 05/19/2017 | Set for hearing May 25. | ||
Senate | 05/15/2017 | May 15 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. | ||
Senate | 05/04/2017 | Set for hearing May 15. | ||
Senate | 05/03/2017 | May 8 hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Senate | 05/01/2017 | Set for hearing May 8. | ||
Senate | 04/17/2017 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 04/17/2017 | Withdrawn from committee. | ||
Senate | 04/05/2017 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 7. Noes 1. Page 624.) (April 5). Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | ||
Senate | 03/10/2017 | Set for hearing April 5. | ||
Senate | 02/16/2017 | Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and PUB. S. | ||
Senate | 02/03/2017 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 5. | ||
Senate | 02/02/2017 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |