California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB223 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 2, 2017

Enrolled

Bill September 18, 2017

Chaptered

Bill October 13, 2017

Amended

Bill September 5, 2017
Bill June 21, 2017
Bill April 26, 2017
Bill April 5, 2017