|
09/30/2018
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 951, Statutes of 2018.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2018
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/06/2018
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2018
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 6060.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/29/2018
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/28/2018
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/28/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6707.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2018
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2018
|
Read third time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/06/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/05/2018
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/03/2018
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (July 3).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/18/2018
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/23/2018
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/22/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4067.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2018
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 4020.) (January 9).
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/05/2018
|
Set for hearing January 9.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/03/2018
|
Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/03/2018
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/21/2017
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/21/2017
|
Withdrawn from committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/21/2017
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2017
|
May 25 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Set for hearing May 25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2017
|
May 1 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2017
|
Set for hearing May 1.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 783.) (April 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2017
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on EQ.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2017
|
Set for hearing April 19.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2017
|
Referred to Com. on EQ.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/03/2017
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 5.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2017
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|